US HB3325 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Communications and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Communications Commission, upon obtaining evidence that suggests an intentional robocall violation, to provide such evidence to the Department of Justice and to report annually on the number and type of such instances.
Title
Locking Up Robocallers Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] | Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] |
Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] | Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2019-06-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-06-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3375 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate.
SB151 (Related) 2019-12-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-105. (TXT | PDF)
SB151 (Related) 2019-12-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-105. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Justice
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Justice
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
Science, technology, communications
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3325/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3325/BILLS-116hr3325ih.pdf |