US HB3348 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 44-4)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-08 - FOR FURTHER ACTION, see H.R. 3633.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-08 - FOR FURTHER ACTION, see H.R. 3633.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Digital Television Transition and Public Safety Act of 2005 to extend through FY2012 (under current law, through FY2010) the requirement that the Assistant Secretary for Communications and Information of the Department of Commerce make payments from the Digital Television Transition and Public Safety Fund for a grant program to assist public safety agencies in the the acquisition of, deployment of, or training for the use of interoperable communications equipment that utilizes reallocated public safety spectrum for radio communication. Allows the Assistant Secretary to extend, on a case-by-case basis, the period of performance for any investment approved under the program for a period not to exceed two years.
Title
To amend the Digital Television Transition and Public Safety Act of 2005 to extend the interoperable emergency communications grant program through fiscal year 2012.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-08 | FOR FURTHER ACTION, see H.R. 3633. | |
2009-07-28 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications, Technology, and the Internet. | |
2009-07-27 | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1819 (Related) 2009-10-08 - FOR FURTHER ACTION, see H.R. 3633.
HB3633 (Related) 2009-10-15 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
SB1694 (Related) 2009-11-06 - Became Public Law No: 111-96.
HB3633 (Related) 2009-10-15 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended).
SB1694 (Related) 2009-11-06 - Became Public Law No: 111-96.
Subjects
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Emergency communications systems
Government trust funds
Science, technology, communications
Emergency communications systems
Government trust funds
Science, technology, communications
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/3348/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr3348/BILLS-111hr3348ih.pdf |