US HB3445 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends by three years certain minimum adjustments to the work geographic index with respect to the payment of physician services under Medicare.
Title
To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to extend the work geographic index floor under the Medicare program.
Sponsors
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3001 (Related) 2019-12-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8319 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Rule H. Res. 1129 passed House.
HR1129 (Similar To) 2020-09-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8337 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-159. (TXT | PDF)
HB8319 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Rule H. Res. 1129 passed House.
HR1129 (Similar To) 2020-09-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8337 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-159. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3445/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3445/BILLS-116hr3445ih.pdf |