US HB3567 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Welfare Integrity Now for Children and Families Act of 2012 or WIN for Children and Families Act - Amends part A (Temporary Assistance for Needy Families) (TANF) of title IV of the Social Security Act to require a state to which a state family assistance grant is made to maintain policies and practices necessary to prevent the use of state TANF assistance in any electronic benefit transfer transaction in a liquor store, casino or gambling establishment, or strip club. Defines "electronic benefit transfer transaction" as the use of a credit or debit card service, automated teller machine (ATM), point-of-sale terminal, or access to an online system for the withdrawal of funds or the processing of a payment for merchandise or a service. Establishes administrative penalties for states which have not reported on their implementation of or enforced such policies and practices.
Title
Welfare Integrity Now for Children and Families Act of 2012
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-01 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 395 N: 27 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 395 N: 27 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 395 N: 27 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2012-02-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-02-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 27 (Roll no. 20). (text: CR H315) |
2012-02-01 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H355-356) |
2012-02-01 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2012-02-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3567. |
2012-02-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H315-322) |
2012-02-01 | House | Mr. Boustany moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2011-12-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SB943 (Same As) 2011-05-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3659 (Related) 2011-12-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3630 (Related) 2012-02-22 - Became Public Law No: 112-96.
HB3659 (Related) 2011-12-15 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3630 (Related) 2012-02-22 - Became Public Law No: 112-96.
Subjects
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Gambling
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social welfare
State and local government operations
Gambling
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social welfare
State and local government operations