US HB431 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 187-115-1-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-07 - Became Public Law No: 114-5. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 187-115-1-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-07 - Became Public Law No: 114-5. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To award a Congressional Gold Medal to the Foot Soldiers who participated in Bloody Sunday, Turnaround Tuesday, or the final Selma to Montgomery Voting Rights March in March of 1965, which served as a catalyst for the Voting Rights Act of 1965. (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Speaker of the House and the President Pro Tempore of the Senate to arrange for the presentation, on behalf of Congress, of a gold medal to the Foot Soldiers who participated in Bloody Sunday, Turnaround Tuesday, or the final Selma to Montgomery Voting Rights March during March of 1965, which served as a catalyst for the Voting Rights Act of 1965. (Sec. 4) The medals struck pursuant to this Act are national medals.
Title
To award a Congressional Gold Medal to the Foot Soldiers who participated in Bloody Sunday, Turnaround Tuesday, or the final Selma to Montgomery Voting Rights March in March of 1965, which served as a catalyst for the Voting Rights Act of 1965.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 420 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-07 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-5. (TXT | PDF) |
2015-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1220) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2015-02-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-02-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 420 - 0 (Roll no. 76). (text: CR H930-931) |
2015-02-11 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H960-961) |
2015-02-11 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2015-02-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 431. |
2015-02-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H930-937) |
2015-02-11 | House | Mr. Huizenga (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2015-01-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB527 (Same As) 2015-02-27 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Alabama
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Congressional tributes
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Voting rights
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Congressional tributes
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Protest and dissent
Racial and ethnic relations
U.S. history
Voting rights