US HB4336 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend through 2013 the exclusion from gross income of income attributable to the discharge of indebtedness on a principal residence.
Title
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the exclusion from gross income of discharges of qualified principal residence indebtedness.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV] | Rep. Rick Berg [R-ND] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] |
Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Dan Burton [R-IN] |
Rep. Howard Coble [R-NC] | Rep. Geoff Davis [R-KY] | Rep. Charles Dent [R-PA] | Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] |
Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Rep. Jim Gerlach [R-PA] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] | Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR] |
Rep. Joseph Heck [R-NV] | Rep. Wally Herger [R-CA] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] |
Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] |
Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] | Rep. Ron Paul [R-TX] | Rep. Thomas Petri [R-WI] |
Rep. Joseph Pitts [R-PA] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Tom Price [R-GA] | Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] |
Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] |
Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4202 (Related) 2012-03-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4250 (Related) 2012-03-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2250 (Related) 2012-03-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4290 (Related) 2012-03-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB3224 (Related) 2012-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4250 (Related) 2012-03-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2250 (Related) 2012-03-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4290 (Related) 2012-03-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB3224 (Related) 2012-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/4336/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr4336/BILLS-112hr4336ih.pdf |