US HB4356 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-285.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-285.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the conditions allowing a service member to terminate a commercial mobile, telephone exchange, internet access, or multichannel video programming service contract at any time after the date the service member receives military orders to relocate for at least 90 days to a location that does not support such contract. It treats as individuals covered, and therefore allowed to terminate such a contract (1) a spouse or dependent of a service member who dies while in military service or a member of the reserve components performing full-time or active reserve duty or inactive-duty training; (2) a spouse or dependent of a service member who incurs a catastrophic injury or illness, if the member incurs the injury or illness while in military service or performing such duty; and (3) a member of the reserve components performing such duty.
Title
Protecting Families of Fallen Servicemembers Act
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-05 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-285. |
2021-01-05 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-12-24 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-12-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7508) |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-11-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-11-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8757) |
2019-11-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4356. |
2019-11-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8757-8758) |
2019-11-12 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-29 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Discharged. |
2019-10-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2019-09-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-09-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2963 (Related) 2019-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Contracts and agency
Family relationships
Internet and video services
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Telephone and wireless communication
Television and film
Contracts and agency
Family relationships
Internet and video services
Military personnel and dependents
National Guard and reserves
Telephone and wireless communication
Television and film