US HB4691 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 87.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 87.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a K-12 education cybersecurity initiative, and for other purposes.
Title
K–12 Cybersecurity Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Andrew Garbarino [R-NY] |
Rep. Andrew Clyde [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 87. |
2021-09-14 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 117-122. |
2021-07-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-28 | House | Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation Discharged. |
2021-07-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation. |
2021-07-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2021-07-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1917 (Same As) 2021-10-08 - Became Public Law No: 117-47.