US HB473 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-4)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To authorize the Every Word We Utter Monument to establish a commemorative work in the District of Columbia and its environs, and for other purposes. This bill authorizes the establishment on federal land in the District of Columbia of the Every Word We Utter Monument in commemoration of the passage of the 19th Amendment to the Constitution, which gave women the right to vote.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To authorize the Every Word We Utter Monument to establish a commemorative work in the District of Columbia and its environs, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-01-10HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1705 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback