US HB5069 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Smart Building Acceleration Act of 2018
Title
Smart Building Acceleration Act of 2018
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1460 (Related) 2017-09-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
SB2447 (Related) 2018-02-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2447 (Related) 2018-02-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Building construction
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Public contracts and procurement
Public utilities and utility rates
Research and development
Water quality
Water use and supply
Worker safety and health
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Public contracts and procurement
Public utilities and utility rates
Research and development
Water quality
Water use and supply
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5069/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5069/BILLS-115hr5069ih.pdf |