US HB5366 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Safeguarding America's Skies Act of 2018
Title
Safeguarding America's Skies Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency. |
2018-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2018-03-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Homeland Security, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2018-03-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/5366/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr5366/BILLS-115hr5366ih.pdf |