US HB5509 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on September 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-15 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-15 - Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To modernize permitting systems at the Department of the Interior, and for other purposes.
Title
Electronic Permitting Modernization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] | Rep. Mary Peltola [D-AK] |
Rep. Marcus Molinaro [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-11-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-11-15 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries Discharged |
2023-10-25 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-10-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries. |
2023-09-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-09-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/5509/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr5509/BILLS-118hr5509ih.pdf |