US HB745 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the duties and authorities of the Office of Government Ethics (OGE) and reauthorizes the OGE through FY2023. Among other things, the bill authorizes the OGE to issue subpoenas during investigations, and order corrective actions (e.g., divestiture) and issue administrative remedies (e.g., suspension or demotion). The OGE must provide ethics education and training to all designated and alternate designated agency ethics officials, who must register with, and report to, the OGE and their appointing authority. Agency ethics officials must provide specified ethics records to the OGE in a searchable, sortable, and downloadable format; such information must be published on the OGE's website.
Title
Executive Branch Comprehensive Ethics Enforcement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 325. |
2020-02-21 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Reform. H. Rept. 116-403, Part I. |
2019-03-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 15. |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Employment and training programs
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Internet and video services
Office of Government Ethics
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Internet and video services
Office of Government Ethics
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents