US HB877 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-8)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 513.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-08 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 513.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions of the Pittman-Robertson Wildlife Restoration Act relating to the funding of wildlife conservation. Specifically, the bill adds new definitions, including a definition of hunter recruitment and recreational shooter recruitment; apportions to states revenues from taxes on pistols, revolvers, bows, and arrows at a rate not greater than 3% and not less than 1% of such revenues; removes the existing prohibition in the Act on public relations to allow spending by states for management of wildlife areas and promotion of hunting and recreational shooting; allows the use of grant funds for the enhancement of hunter recruitment and recreational shooter recruitment; and expands the Multistate Conservation Grant program by providing $5 million exclusively for making hunter and recreational shooter recruitment project grants that promote a national hunting and shooting sport recruitment program, including related communication and outreach activities. The Fish and Wildlife Service shall review and evaluate the effects of funds used for hunter and recreational shooter recruitment on funds available for wildlife conservation.
Title
Modernizing the Pittman-Robertson Fund for Tomorrow’s Needs Act
Sponsors
Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] |
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] |
Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] |
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN] |
Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] |
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS] | Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 513. |
2020-12-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-628. |
2019-12-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-12-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-12-05 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2019-03-26 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2092 (Related) 2019-07-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB3051 (Related) 2020-10-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-188. (TXT | PDF)
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94. (TXT | PDF)
SB3051 (Related) 2020-10-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-188. (TXT | PDF)
HB1865 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-94. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Firearms and explosives
Government studies and investigations
Hunting and fishing
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Sales and excise taxes
State and local finance
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Firearms and explosives
Government studies and investigations
Hunting and fishing
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
Sales and excise taxes
State and local finance
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection