US HB935 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 to exempt from registration brokers performing services in connection with the transfer of ownership of smaller privately held companies.
Title
Small Business Mergers, Acquisitions, Sales, and Brokerage Simplification Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 419 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2022-05-11 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-05-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 0 (Roll no. 158). (text: 05/10/2022 CR H4746-4747) |
2022-05-11 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4837-4838) |
2022-05-10 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-05-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 935. |
2022-05-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4746-4748) |
2022-05-10 | House | Mr. Garcia (IL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-05-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 233. |
2022-05-10 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 117-313. |
2021-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-07-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-02-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3391 (Related) 2022-04-05 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held.