US HR1038 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives condemning the Russian Federation, President Vladimir Putin, members of the Russian Security Council, the Russian Armed Forces, and Russian military commanders for committing atrocities, including alleged war crimes, against the people of Ukraine and others.
Title
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives condemning the Russian Federation, President Vladimir Putin, members of the Russian Security Council, the Russian Armed Forces, and Russian military commanders for committing atrocities, including alleged war crimes, against the people of Ukraine and others.
Sponsors
Rep. Victoria Spartz [R-IN] | Rep. Stephanie Bice [R-OK] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] |
Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2022-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR963 (Related) 2022-03-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SR531 (Related) 2022-03-03 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S994-995)
SR546 (Same As) 2022-03-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1185-1186; text: CR S1180-1181)
SR531 (Related) 2022-03-03 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S994-995)
SR546 (Same As) 2022-03-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1185-1186; text: CR S1180-1181)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1038/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1038/BILLS-117hres1038ih.pdf |