US HR963 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 75-4)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives condemning the Russian Federation, President Vladimir Putin, members of the Russian Security Council, the Russian Armed Forces, and Russian military commanders for committing flagrant acts of aggression and other atrocities rising to the level of crimes against humanity and war crimes against the people of Ukraine and others.
Title
Expressing the sense of the House of Representatives condemning the Russian Federation, President Vladimir Putin, members of the Russian Security Council, the Russian Armed Forces, and Russian military commanders for committing flagrant acts of aggression and other atrocities rising to the level of crimes against humanity and war crimes against the people of Ukraine and others.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2022-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR531 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S994-995)
SR546 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1185-1186; text: CR S1180-1181)
HR1038 (Related) 2022-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SR546 (Related) 2022-03-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1185-1186; text: CR S1180-1181)
HR1038 (Related) 2022-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/963/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres963/BILLS-117hres963ih.pdf |