US SR546 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1185-1186; text: CR S1180-1181)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1185-1186; text: CR S1180-1181)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate condemning the Russian Federation, President Vladimir Putin, members of the Russian Security Council, the Russian Armed Forces, and Russian military commanders for committing atrocities, including alleged war crimes, against the people of Ukraine and others.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate condemning the Russian Federation, President Vladimir Putin, members of the Russian Security Council, the Russian Armed Forces, and Russian military commanders for committing atrocities, including alleged war crimes, against the people of Ukraine and others.
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] |
Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Mark Kelly [D-AZ] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1185-1186; text: CR S1180-1181) |
Same As/Similar To
HR963 (Related) 2022-03-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SR531 (Related) 2022-03-03 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S994-995)
HR1038 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SR531 (Related) 2022-03-03 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S994-995)
HR1038 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/546/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres546/BILLS-117sres546ats.pdf |