US HR281 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-30 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-30 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Calls on China (PRC) to end the practice of organ harvesting from prisoners, and particularly from Falun Gong prisoners of conscience and members of other religious and ethnic minority groups. Calls for a Department of State investigation into organ transplant practices in China, and for the prosecution of those found to have engaged in such practices. Demands an end to the persecution of the Falun Gong spiritual practice by the Communist Party of China and the release of all Falun Gong practitioners and other prisoners of conscience. Recommends that: (1) the Department issue a travel warning for U.S. citizens traveling to China for organ transplants informing them that the organ source for their operation may be a prisoner of conscience; and (2) the U.S. government condemn organ transplantation abuses in China, ban the entry of those who have participated in such activities, and prosecute such individuals should they be found on U.S. soil.
Title
Expressing concern over persistent and credible reports of systematic, state-sanctioned organ harvesting from non-consenting prisoners of conscience, in the People's Republic of China, including from large numbers of Falun Gong practitioners imprisoned for their religious beliefs, and members of other religious and ethnic minority groups.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2014-07-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-12-11 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Unanimous Consent . |
2013-12-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-07-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific. |
2013-07-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, Global Human Rights and International Organizations. |
2013-06-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Subjects
Asia
China
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Government information and archives
Human rights
International affairs
Medical ethics
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Sanctions
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
China
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Detention of persons
Government information and archives
Human rights
International affairs
Medical ethics
Organ and tissue donation and transplantation
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Sanctions
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-resolution/281/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hres281/BILLS-113hres281ih.pdf |