US HR296 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 121-21)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution states that it is U.S. policy to (1) commemorate the Armenian Genocide, the killing of 1.5 million Armenians by the Ottoman Empire from 1915 to 1923; (2) reject efforts to associate the U.S. government with efforts to deny the existence of the Armenian Genocide or any genocide; and (3) encourage education and public understanding about the Armenian Genocide.
Title
Affirming the United States record on the Armenian Genocide.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-29 - House - On agreeing to the resolution RC# 591 (Y: 405 N: 11 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-29 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 405 - 11, 3 Present (Roll no. 591). (text: CR H8560) |
2019-10-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8583-8584) |
2019-10-29 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.Res. 296, the Chair put the question on agreeing to the resolution and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Engel demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2019-10-29 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2019-10-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 296. |
2019-10-29 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H. Res. 296 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered. |
2019-10-29 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 655. (consideration: CR H8559-8568) |
2019-10-29 | House | Rule H. Res. 655 passed House. |
2019-10-28 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 655 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H. Res. 296 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-04-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR150 (Same As) 2019-12-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 4/9/2019 CR S2333)
HR655 (Related) 2019-10-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR655 (Related) 2019-10-29 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armenia
Asia
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Europe
Human rights
International affairs
Racial and ethnic relations
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
World history
Asia
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Europe
Human rights
International affairs
Racial and ethnic relations
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
World history