US HR354 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 139-31)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Celebrating the 100th anniversary of the passage and ratification of the 19th Amendment, providing for women's suffrage, to the Constitution of the United States. This resolution celebrates the 100th anniversary of the passage and ratification of the Nineteenth Amendment to the Constitution, providing for women's suffrage. The resolution also reaffirms the desire of Congress to continue strengthening democratic participation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Celebrating the 100th anniversary of the passage and ratification of the 19th Amendment, providing for women's suffrage, to the Constitution of the United States.

Sponsors

Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Debbie Lesko [D-AZ]Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]
Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]
Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL]
Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]
Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]
Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]
Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL]Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ]Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]
Rep. Amata Radewagen [D-AS]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]
Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]
Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]
Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]
Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. Elizabeth Fletcher [D-TX]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX]
Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC]Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]
Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL]Rep. Kevin McCarthy [R-CA]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI]
Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]
Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]
Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]
Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY]Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-05-21HouseOn agreeing to the resolution Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H4024)
2019-05-21HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4024)
2019-05-21HouseMs. Dean asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
2019-05-21HouseCommittee on the Judiciary discharged.
2019-05-20HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
2019-05-03HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
2019-05-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SR212 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Yea-Nay Vote. 93 - 0. Record Vote Number: 132. (text: CR 5/16/2019 S2928)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback