US HR567 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution supports the designation of National Concussion Awareness Day.
Title
Supporting the designation of September 20, 2019, as "National Concussion Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI] |
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] |
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-09-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-09-19 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR349 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5760; text: CR S5754-5755)
HR1127 (Same As) 2020-09-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR708 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S5713)
HR1127 (Same As) 2020-09-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR708 (Related) 2020-09-17 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S5713)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Neurological disorders
Congressional tributes
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Medical research
Neurological disorders
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-resolution/567/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hres567/BILLS-116hres567ih.pdf |