US HR775 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth the rule for consideration of the bill (S. 2244) to extend the termination date of the Terrorism Insurance Program established under the Terrorism Risk Insurance Act of 2002, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules; and providing for proceedings during the period from December 12, 2014, through January 3, 2015.
Title
Providing for consideration of the bill (S. 2244) to extend the termination date of the Terrorism Insurance Program established under the Terrorism Risk Insurance Act of 2002, and for other purposes; providing for consideration of motions to suspend the rules; and providing for proceedings during the period from December 12, 2014, through January 3, 2015.
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-10 - House - On Agreeing to the Resolution (Y: 231 N: 189 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2014-12-10 | House | On agreeing to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 231 - 189 (Roll no. 554). (text: CR H8962) |
2014-12-10 | House | The previous question was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H8966-8967) |
2014-12-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H. Res. 775. |
2014-12-10 | House | Considered as privileged matter. (consideration: CR H8962-8967) |
2014-12-09 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 149. |
2014-12-09 | House | The House Committee on Rules reported an original measure, H. Rept. 113-654, by Mr. Sessions. |
2014-12-09 | House | Resolution provides for consideration of S. 2244; provides suspension authority; and provides for proceedings through Jan. 3, 2015. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2244 (Related) 2014-12-11 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.