US HR804 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth the rule for consideration of the amendment to H.B. 1016 (Veterans Health Care Budget Reform and Transparency Act of 2009).
Title
Veterans Health Care Budget Reform and Transparency Act of 2009
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-08 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-10-08 | On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 1 (Roll no. 771). (text: CR 10/7/2009 H10554-10555) | |
2009-10-08 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H11142) | |
2009-10-07 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2009-10-07 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Res. 804. | |
2009-10-07 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10554-10559) | |
2009-10-07 | Mr. Filner moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution. | |
2009-10-07 | Referred to the House Committee on Rules. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1016 (Related) 2009-10-22 - Became Public Law No: 111-81.