US SB1061 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-36.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

John F. Kennedy Center Reauthorization Act of 2019 This bill reauthorizes funding for FY2020-FY2024 for maintenance, repair, and security and capital projects for the John F. Kennedy Center for the Performing Arts. The bill directs that a plaque be placed within the Kennedy Center that contains an inscription to commemorate the 60th anniversary of the signing of the National Cultural Center Act by President Dwight D. Eisenhower. The Kennedy Center may solicit private contributions for the design, procurement, and installation of the plaque.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

John F. Kennedy Center Reauthorization Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateBy Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-36.
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 72.
2019-04-10SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report.
2019-04-08SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Same As/Similar To

HB2197 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback