US SB1328 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes an alien inadmissible to the United States or deportable if there are reasonable grounds to believe that the alien seeks to enter the country to improperly interfere with a U.S. election, or has previously done so. Improper interference in a U.S. election is conduct by an alien that (1) violates federal criminal, voting rights, or campaign finance law, or is under the direction of a foreign government; and (2) interferes with any general or primary federal, state, or local election or caucus, including a candidate's campaign or a ballot measure.
Title
DETER Act Defending Elections against Trolls from Enemy Regimes Act
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-06-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-06-04 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3169; text: CR S3169) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 96. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB482 (Related) 2019-12-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 389.
HB3442 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
HB3442 (Related) 2019-07-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Immigration
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Subversive activities
Voting rights
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Immigration
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
Subversive activities
Voting rights