US SB1330 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Family Dairy Preservation Act of 2009 - Amends the Food, Conservation, and Energy Act of 2008 to increase milk income loss contract payments for the period March 1, 2009-November 30, 2009.
Title
Family Dairy Preservation Act of 2009
Sponsors
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-23 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3322 (Related) 2010-06-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry.
SB1398 (Related) 2009-07-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB1398 (Related) 2009-07-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/1330/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s1330/BILLS-111s1330is.pdf |