US SB1857 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Federal Energy and Water Management Performance Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Energy and Water Management Performance Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
2019-07-09SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.
2019-06-13SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Same As/Similar To

HB3962 (Related) 2019-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
SB2137 (Related) 2019-09-11 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback