US SB2143 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-04 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Entrepreneurship Act - Amends the Small Business Act to prohibit the Administrator of the Small Business Administration (SBA) from assessing a guarantee fee in connection with a loan made under the SBA Express Program to a veteran or spouse of a veteran on or after October 1, 2014. Directs the Administrator to report to Congress on: (1) the feasibility of providing financial planning and counseling to owners of small business concerns who are members of a reserve component prior to deployment; (2) the level of outreach to and consultation with female veterans by women's business centers and veterans business outreach centers; and (3) the Military Reservists Economic Injury Disaster Loan Program, which shall include a discussion of SBA outreach efforts to increase participation, the number of loans made, and an analysis of the effectiveness of, and recommendations for improving, the Program.
Title
Veterans Entrepreneurship Act
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-04 | Senate | Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5045 (Related) 2014-07-09 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Subjects
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Financial services and investments
Government lending and loan guarantees
National Guard and reserves
Small business
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Financial services and investments
Government lending and loan guarantees
National Guard and reserves
Small business
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/2143/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s2143/BILLS-113s2143is.pdf |