US SB2166 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 396.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 396.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides a mechanism for coastal states to participate in a Regional Ocean Partnership with one or more other coastal states that share a common ocean or coastal area. Specifically, the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration may designate a partnership as a Regional Ocean Partnership if it (1) is established to coordinate the interstate management of ocean and coastal resources; (2) focuses on the environmental issues affecting the ocean and coastal areas of the coastal states participating in the partnership; (3) complements existing state coastal and ocean management efforts on an interstate scale, focusing on shared regional priorities; (4) does not have a regulatory function; and (5) is not duplicative of an existing Regional Ocean Partnership. A Regional Ocean Partnership may use provided federal funds to award grants and enter into contracts for certain purposes, including to monitor the water quality and living resources of multistate ocean and coastal ecosystems.
Title
Regional Ocean Partnership Act
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 396. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-185. |
2019-07-24 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-07-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB5390 (Related) 2020-11-17 - Committee Hearings Held.
Subjects
Alabama
Aquatic ecology
Atlantic Coast (U.S.)
California
Congressional oversight
Connecticut
Delaware
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental education
Federal-Indian relations
Florida
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Gulf of Mexico
Indian lands and resources rights
Intergovernmental relations
Louisiana
Maine
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Maryland
Massachusetts
Mississippi
New Hampshire
New Jersey
New York State
Oregon
Pacific Ocean
Public lands and natural resources
Rhode Island
State and local government operations
Texas
Vermont
Virginia
Washington State
Water quality
Aquatic ecology
Atlantic Coast (U.S.)
California
Congressional oversight
Connecticut
Delaware
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental education
Federal-Indian relations
Florida
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Gulf of Mexico
Indian lands and resources rights
Intergovernmental relations
Louisiana
Maine
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Maryland
Massachusetts
Mississippi
New Hampshire
New Jersey
New York State
Oregon
Pacific Ocean
Public lands and natural resources
Rhode Island
State and local government operations
Texas
Vermont
Virginia
Washington State
Water quality