US SB2408 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
No Surface Occupancy Western Arctic Coastal Plain Domestic Energy Security Act - Authorizes the exploration, leasing, development and production of oil and gas on the Western Coastal Plain of Alaska. Directs the Secretary of the Interior to: (1) establish a competitive oil and gas leasing program for oil and gas exploration, development, and production on the Western Coastal Plain; and (2) prohibit surface occupancy of the Western Coastal Plain during any oil and gas development and production States that, in connection with specified environmental protection laws, the Secretary shall neither: (1) identify nonleasing alternative courses of action, nor (2) analyze the environmental effect of those courses of action. Requires the Secretary, within one year after the first lease sale is conducted under this Act, to conduct a second lease sale (and additional sales if sufficient interest in exploration or development exists). Sets forth procedures for: (1) lease sales and lease grants on the Western Coastal Plain, and (2) Western Coastal Plain environmental protection. Prescribes a revenue allocation scheme derived from bonus, rental, and royalty revenues from federal oil and gas leasing and operations authorized under this Act, including monthly payments to the state of Alaska. Requires the Secretary to convey to: (1) the Kaktovik Inupiat Corporation the surface estate of certain land, and (2) the Arctic Slope Regional Corporation the remaining subsurface estate to which that Corporation is entitled under a specified agreement.
Title
No Surface Occupancy Western Arctic Coastal Plain Domestic Energy Security Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3298-3299) |
Same As/Similar To
HB49 (Related) 2013-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
HB2674 (Related) 2013-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB3033 (Related) 2013-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
HB4286 (Related) 2014-04-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
SB2170 (Related) 2014-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2409 (Related) 2014-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2674 (Related) 2013-09-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB3033 (Related) 2013-09-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Reform, Commercial And Antitrust Law.
HB4286 (Related) 2014-04-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
SB2170 (Related) 2014-03-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2409 (Related) 2014-05-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Alaska
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Arctic and polar regions
Arctic Ocean
Department of the Interior
Energy
Energy revenues and royalties
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Indian lands and resources rights
Labor-management relations
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Oil and gas
State and local finance
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Alaska
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Arctic and polar regions
Arctic Ocean
Department of the Interior
Energy
Energy revenues and royalties
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Indian lands and resources rights
Labor-management relations
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Oil and gas
State and local finance
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/2408/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s2408/BILLS-113s2408is.pdf |