US SB2740 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act to clarify the regulatory framework with respect to certain nonprescription drugs that are marketed without an approved new drug application, and for other purposes.
Title
Over-the-Counter Monograph Safety, Innovation, and Reform Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-10 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment RC# 389 (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-12-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-12-11 | House | Received in the House. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-12-10 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 91 - 2. Record Vote Number: 389. (consideration: CR S6921-6930; text: CR S6921-6930) |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 290. |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Alexander without amendment. Without written report. |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-10-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3443 (Related) 2019-07-24 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E971)
HB269 (Related) 2019-01-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 10.
HB19 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB269 (Related) 2019-01-10 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 10.
HB19 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
HB748 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Child health
Congressional oversight
Cosmetics and personal care
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Inflation and prices
Judicial review and appeals
Marketing and advertising
User charges and fees
Administrative remedies
Child health
Congressional oversight
Cosmetics and personal care
Department of Health and Human Services
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Inflation and prices
Judicial review and appeals
Marketing and advertising
User charges and fees