US SB4064 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Justice (DOJ) to develop law enforcement training curricula in alternatives to the use of force, de-escalation tactics, and techniques for safely responding to a person experiencing a behavioral health crisis. DOJ shall also make grants to states for law enforcement officers to acquire such training from the DOJ or an equivalent program offered by a DOJ-certified entity.
Title
Law Enforcement De-Escalation Training Act of 2020
Sponsors
Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3985 (Related) 2021-01-01 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S7995)
HB7278 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8088 (Related) 2020-08-22 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB7278 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB8088 (Related) 2020-08-22 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
State and local government operations
Criminal justice information and records
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Mental health
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4064/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4064/BILLS-116s4064is.pdf |