US SB416 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1137; text: CR S1137-1138)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1137; text: CR S1137-1138)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the Free Application for Federal Student Aid (FAFSA) process for certain students. Specifically, the Department of Education must allow students to complete FAFSA as independent students under special circumstances. It also requires financial aid administrators to provide those students with a final determination regarding their assistance in the same manner as, and by no later than the date that, they provide other provisionally independent students with that determination.
Title
FAFSA Fairness Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1137; text: CR S1137-1138) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1075 (Same As) 2020-01-30 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Trone asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 1075, a bill originally introduced by Representative Elijah Cummings, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
HB3101 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
SB1346 (Related) 2019-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB3101 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations.
SB1346 (Related) 2019-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Education
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
School administration
Student aid and college costs
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
School administration
Student aid and college costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/416/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s416/BILLS-116s416is.pdf |