US SB1346 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to amend the Higher Education Act of 1965 to require the Secretary to provide for the use of data from the second preceding tax year to carry out the simplification of applications for the estimation and determination of financial aid eligibility, to increase the income threshold to qualify for a student aid index equal to or less than zero, and for other purposes.
Title
Simplifying Financial Aid for Students Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB640 (Related) 2019-01-17 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1075 (Related) 2020-01-30 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Trone asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 1075, a bill originally introduced by Representative Elijah Cummings, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
SB1364 (Related) 2019-05-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB416 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1137; text: CR S1137-1138)
HB2486 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate amendment.
HR891 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1075 (Related) 2020-01-30 - ASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Trone asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 1075, a bill originally introduced by Representative Elijah Cummings, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings pursuant to clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
SB1364 (Related) 2019-05-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB416 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1137; text: CR S1137-1138)
HB2486 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Message on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate amendment.
HR891 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Adoption and foster care
Census and government statistics
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Criminal justice information and records
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Immigration status and procedures
Licensing and registrations
School administration
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Student aid and college costs
Student records
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Temporary and part-time employment
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Wages and earnings
Census and government statistics
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Criminal justice information and records
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Higher education
Homelessness and emergency shelter
Immigration status and procedures
Licensing and registrations
School administration
Separation, divorce, custody, support
Student aid and college costs
Student records
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Temporary and part-time employment
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/1346/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s1346/BILLS-116s1346is.pdf |