US SB4382 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
Pending: Senate Rules And Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to direct the Joint Committee on the Library to replace the bust of Roger Brooke Taney in the Old Supreme Court Chamber of the Capitol with a bust of Thurgood Marshall to be obtained by the Joint Committee on the Library and to remove certain statues from areas of the Capitol which are accessible to the public, to remove all statues of individuals who voluntarily served the Confederate States of America from display in the Capitol, and for other purposes.
Title
A bill to direct the Joint Committee on the Library to replace the bust of Roger Brooke Taney in the Old Supreme Court Chamber of the Capitol with a bust of Thurgood Marshall to be obtained by the Joint Committee on the Library and to remove certain statues from areas of the Capitol which are accessible to the public, to remove all statues of individuals who voluntarily served the Confederate States of America from display in the Capitol, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
Same As/Similar To
HB6131 (Related) 2020-03-09 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB7217 (Related) 2020-06-15 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB7473 (Same As) 2020-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Select Revenue Measures.
SB3863 (Related) 2020-06-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB3957 (Related) 2020-06-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB7573 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - Received in the Senate.
HB7217 (Related) 2020-06-15 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB7473 (Same As) 2020-07-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Select Revenue Measures.
SB3863 (Related) 2020-06-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB3957 (Related) 2020-06-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
HB7573 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Arkansas
Art, artists, authorship
Conflicts and wars
Congress
Judges
Members of Congress
Military history
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
North Carolina
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Racial and ethnic relations
Senate
Smithsonian Institution
State and local government operations
Supreme Court
U.S. Capitol
U.S. history
Art, artists, authorship
Conflicts and wars
Congress
Judges
Members of Congress
Military history
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
North Carolina
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Racial and ethnic relations
Senate
Smithsonian Institution
State and local government operations
Supreme Court
U.S. Capitol
U.S. history
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/4382/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s4382/BILLS-116s4382is.pdf |