US SB4401 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on August 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-08-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Environmental Justice For All Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental Justice For All Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-03SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Same As/Similar To

HB729 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1334 (Related) 2019-03-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
HB2268 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4273 (Related) 2019-09-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB4512 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB5986 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1458 (Related) 2019-05-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2467 (Related) 2019-09-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Air quality
Buy American requirements
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Community life and organization
Congressional oversight
Cosmetics and personal care
Department of Transportation
Drug safety, medical device, and laboratory regulation
Due process and equal protection
Ecology
Economic development
Electric power generation and transmission
Employee benefits and pensions
Employment and training programs
Energy revenues and royalties
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental education
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Evidence and witnesses
Executive agency funding and structure
Executive Office of the President
Federal officials
Federal-Indian relations
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Geography and mapping
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Gulf of Mexico
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Higher education
Historical and cultural resources
Housing and community development funding
Indian lands and resources rights
Indian social and development programs
Infrastructure development
Intergovernmental relations
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Legal fees and court costs
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marketing and advertising
Medical research
Mining
Minority health
Monuments and memorials
Oil and gas
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Performance measurement
Poverty and welfare assistance
Product safety and quality
Public participation and lobbying
Public transit
Public-private cooperation
Racial and ethnic relations
Regional and metropolitan planning
Research administration and funding
Rural conditions and development
Sex and reproductive health
Soil pollution
Solid waste and recycling
State and local government operations
Transportation programs funding
Urban and suburban affairs and development
User charges and fees
Water quality
Water use and supply
Women's health
Youth employment and child labor

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback