US SB666 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-6-1)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Animal Fighting Spectator Prohibition Act of 2013 - Amends the Animal Welfare Act to prohibit any person from knowingly attending an animal fighting venture or causing a minor (a person under the age of 18) to attend such a venture. Subjects any person who: (1) knowingly attends such venture to a fine and/or imprisonment for up to a year for each violation, and (2) knowingly causes a minor to attend such venture to a fine and/or imprisonment for up to three years for each violation.
Title
Animal Fighting Spectator Prohibition Act of 2013
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. |
Same As/Similar To
SB10 (Related) 2013-01-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. (text of measure as introduced: CR S48-156)
HB366 (Related) 2013-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations.
SB954 (Related) 2013-09-04 - By Senator Stabenow from Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2013. Report No. 113-88. Additional views filed.
HB366 (Related) 2013-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations.
SB954 (Related) 2013-09-04 - By Senator Stabenow from Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry filed written report under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2013. Report No. 113-88. Additional views filed.
Subjects
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against animals and natural resources
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against animals and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-bill/666/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/s666/BILLS-113s666is.pdf |