US SB681 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7979)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7979)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Greensburg, Kansas Recovery Extension Act - Requires funds from any national emergency grant made under the Workforce Investment Act of 1998 to address the effects of the May 4, 2007, Greensburg, Kansas, tornado to remain available for expenditure through June 30, 2010.
Title
Greensburg, Kansas Recovery Extension Act
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Brownback [R-KS] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-31 | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7979) | |
2009-03-31 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2009-03-31 | Received in the House. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4008) | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4007-4008) | |
2009-03-24 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2052 (Same As) 2009-05-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities.