US SB746 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to report to Congress regarding the accessibility of VA websites (including attached files and web-based applications) to individuals with disabilities. The report shall identify websites, files, and applications that are not accessible to such individuals and include the VA's plan to make each of them accessible.
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs Website Accessibility Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1199 (Related) 2019-10-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB3587 (Related) 2020-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-213. (TXT | PDF)
SB3587 (Related) 2020-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-213. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability and paralysis
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Disability and paralysis
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/746/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s746/BILLS-116s746is.pdf |