US SB779 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 278.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 278.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
American Battlefield Protection Program Amendments Act of 2011 - Amends the Omnibus Public Land Management Act of 2009, with respect to the Battlefield Acquisition Grant Program, to: (1) expand the current definition of "battlefield report" to include the report entitled "Report to Congress on the Historic Preservation of Revolutionary War and War of 1812 Sites in the United States"; and (2) expand the Program to permit the acquisition not only of an "interest in an eligible site," but also an "eligible site." Requires acquisitions of lands or interests under the Act to be from willing sellers only. Requires the Secretary of the Interior to submit to Congress a report on activities carried out under this Act. Authorizes appropriations through FY2022 to the Secretary for the provision of grants for the protection of Civil War, Revolutionary War, and War of 1812 battlefields.
Title
American Battlefield Protection Program Amendments Act of 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 278. |
2012-01-13 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman under authority of the order of the Senate of 12/17/2011 without amendment. With written report No. 112-116. |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 112-124. |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2489 (Related) 2012-09-11 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 505.
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Europe
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Military history
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history
United Kingdom
Europe
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Military history
Outdoor recreation
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history
United Kingdom