US SB825 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-06 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-06 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A bill to establish the Southern Maryland National Heritage Area, and for other purposes.
Title
Southern Maryland National Heritage Area Act
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-06 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2024 (Same As) 2022-07-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HR1232 (Similar To) 2022-07-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1232 (Similar To) 2022-07-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-bill/825/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/s825/BILLS-117s825is.pdf |