US SB92 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Regulations from the Executive in Need of Scrutiny Act of 2019 This bill revises provisions relating to congressional review of agency rulemaking. Specifically, the bill establishes a congressional approval process for a major rule. A major rule may only take effect if Congress approves of the rule. A major rule is a rule that results in (1) an annual effect on the economy of $100 million or more; (2) a major increase in costs or prices for consumers, individual industries, government agencies, or geographic regions; or (3) significant adverse effects on competition, employment, investment, productivity, innovation, or the ability of U.S.-based enterprises to compete with foreign-based enterprises. In addition, the bill establishes a congressional disapproval process for a nonmajor rule. A nonmajor rule may only take effect if Congress does not disapprove of the rule.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulations from the Executive in Need of Scrutiny Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-01-10SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HB1332 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3972 (Related) 2019-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
SB4537 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback