US SR242 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 6/10/19 CR S3293)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 6/10/19 CR S3293)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution designates June 15, 2019, as World Elder Abuse Awareness Day.
Title
A resolution designating June 15, 2019, as "World Elder Abuse Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] | Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 6/10/19 CR S3293) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4195) |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S3293) |
Same As/Similar To
SR621 (Related) 2020-06-23 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 06/15/2020 CR S2976-2977)
Subjects
Aging
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Law enforcement officers
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Law enforcement officers
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations