US SR387 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-30 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6304-6305)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-30 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6304-6305)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Domestic Violence Awareness Month.
Title
A resolution supporting the goals and ideals of National Domestic Violence Awareness Month, commending domestic violence victim advocates, domestic violence victim service providers, crisis hotline staff, and first responders serving victims of domestic violence for their compassionate support of survivors of domestic violence, and expressing the sense of the Senate that Congress should continue to support efforts to end domestic violence, provide safety for victims of domestic violence and their families, and hold perpetrators of domestic violence accountable.
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-30 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S6304-6305) |
Same As/Similar To
HR673 (Related) 2019-10-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR753 (Related) 2020-11-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 10/22/2020 S6405)
SR753 (Related) 2020-11-30 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 10/22/2020 S6405)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Domestic violence and child abuse
Families
Family services
Crime prevention
Crime victims
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Domestic violence and child abuse
Families
Family services
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-resolution/387/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/sres387/BILLS-116sres387is.pdf |