US SR501 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-28 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7194)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-28 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7194)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing threats to freedom of the press and expression around the world and reaffirming freedom of the press as a priority in efforts of the Government of the United States to promote democracy and good governance.
Title
A resolution recognizing threats to freedom of the press and expression around the world and reaffirming freedom of the press as a priority in efforts of the Government of the United States to promote democracy and good governance.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7194) |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 545. |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2527) |
Same As/Similar To
HR875 (Related) 2018-05-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SR150 (Related) 2017-12-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8154)
SR150 (Related) 2017-12-20 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8154)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional oversight
Congressional tributes
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Evidence and witnesses
Government information and archives
Human rights
International affairs
News media and reporting
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
United Nations
Violent crime
Worker safety and health
Congressional oversight
Congressional tributes
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Evidence and witnesses
Government information and archives
Human rights
International affairs
News media and reporting
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
United Nations
Violent crime
Worker safety and health