UT HB0154 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Use of Force Revisions
Title
Use of Force Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ failed (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ failed in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 4 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-03-02 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Docket Clerk |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ held in House Docket Clerk |
2021-03-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-01 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 3 in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-19 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2021-01-13 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-01-13 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
76 | 2 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 2 | 408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |