UT HB0192 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Former Offender Employment Amendments
Title
Former Offender Employment Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 50 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ Rules to 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-15 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-15 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2022-02-15 | House | House/ floor amendment # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-15 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills |
2022-02-10 | House | House/ comm rpt/ substituted in House Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in House Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Business and Labor Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Business and Labor Committee |
2022-01-28 | House | House Comm - Held in House Business and Labor Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House |
2022-01-19 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-01-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Business
Department of Commerce
Department of Human Services
Health
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Professionals
Human Services
Judicial Operations
Juvenile Justice
Juvenile Justice Services
Juveniles
Labor and Employment
Local Mental Health Authorities
Mental Health
Mental Health Facilities
Mental Health Professionals
Occupational and Professional Licensing
Offender Registries
Substance Abuse
Substance Use Disorder Treatment
Department of Commerce
Department of Human Services
Health
Health Care
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Professionals
Human Services
Judicial Operations
Juvenile Justice
Juvenile Justice Services
Juveniles
Labor and Employment
Local Mental Health Authorities
Mental Health
Mental Health Facilities
Mental Health Professionals
Occupational and Professional Licensing
Offender Registries
Substance Abuse
Substance Use Disorder Treatment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
34 | 52 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
34 | 52 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 501 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 60 | 108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
58 | 60 | 110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |