UT HB0398 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Utah State Instructional Materials Access Center Funding
Title
Utah State Instructional Materials Access Center Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2011-03-10 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK | |
2011-03-09 | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2011-03-01 | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC | |
2011-03-01 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDHB | |
2011-02-24 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTEDU | |
2011-02-22 | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU | |
2011-02-21 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-21 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2011-02-16 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HINTRO | |
2011-02-15 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |