UT HB0398 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ filed in HFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allocation of School Trust Lands Funds
Title
Allocation of School Trust Lands Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - House - House Comm - Held (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - House Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2012-02-28 - House - House Comm - Returned to Rules (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | House/ filed in HFILE | |
2012-03-08 | House/ strike enacting clause in HCLERK | |
2012-03-01 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ amended in HSTRUL | |
2012-03-01 | House Comm - Returned to Rules in HSTEDU | |
2012-02-28 | House Comm - Held in HSTEDU | |
2012-02-28 | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation in HSTEDU | |
2012-02-22 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTEDU | |
2012-02-22 | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU | |
2012-02-22 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-22 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-16 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-16 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in HCLERK | |
2012-02-16 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-16 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-16 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |